Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024