House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Alvord
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Gann
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hays, Maynard, Caldwell (Chad), Stark, McDugle, West (Kevin), Cantrell, Lowe (Dick), Conley, Wolfley, Banning, Kendrix, Staires
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Lepak, Sims
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Roberts
|
|
|