House
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wolfley
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Roberts
|
|
|