House
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/06/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Kerbs
|
|
|