Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2024

Amended

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill February 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024