Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 24 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |