Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024