Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3232 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/10/2024

                             
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3232 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
March 25, 2024 
AS AMENDED 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 3232 	By: Lawson, Waldron, Menz, 
Archer, Sims, and Swope of 
the House 
 
  and 
 
  Gollihare of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
[ Route 66 - Oklahoma Route 66 Commission - 
expiration date - Revolving Fund - budgeting and 
expenditures - effective date ] 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     Section 1, Chapter 412, O.S.L. 
2022 (69 O.S. Supp. 2023, Section 4040), is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 4040. A.  There is hereby created until June 30, 2027, 
the Oklahoma Route 66 Commission.  The Commission shall be composed 
of nine (9) members.  The members shall serve as follows: 
1.  One member shall be appointed by the Governor and selected 
from the Commissioners of the Oklahoma Tax Commi ssion, whose first 
term shall be for one (1) year, and then renewable for three -year 
terms thereafter;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3232 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  One shall be the Executive Director of the Oklahoma 
Department of Transportation, or his or her desi gnee, whose first 
term shall be for two (2) years, and then renewable for three -year 
terms thereafter; 
3.  One shall be the Executive Director of the Oklahoma Tourism 
and Recreation Department, or his or her designee, whose first term 
shall be for three (3 ) years, and then renewable for three -year 
terms thereafter; 
4.  Three members shall be appointed by the President Pro 
Tempore of the Oklahoma State Senate of which: 
a. one shall be a citizen of a county containing a 
portion of Route 66, whose first term s hall be for one 
(1) year, and renewable for three -year terms 
thereafter, 
b. one shall be a city manager, assistant city manager, 
or economic development director for a municipality on 
Route 66 with a population greater than ten thousand 
(10,000), whose first term shall be for two (2) years, 
and renewable for three-year terms thereafter, and 
c. one shall be an Oklahoma citizen with expertise or 
experience in historic preservation, whose first term 
shall be for three (3) years, and then renewable for 
three-year terms thereafter; and   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3232 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
5.  Three members shall be appointed by the Speaker of the 
Oklahoma House of Representatives of which: 
a. one shall be a citizen of a county containing a 
portion of Route 66, whose first term shall be for one 
(1) year, and then ren ewable for three-year terms 
thereafter, 
b. one of whom shall be a business owner whose business 
is located along Route 66 within a city or town whose 
population is less than ten thousand (10,000), whose 
first term shall be for two (2) years, and then 
renewable for three-year terms thereafter, and 
c. one shall be an Oklahoma citizen with expertise or 
experience in marketing, whose first term shall be for 
three (3) years, and then renewable for three -year 
terms thereafter. 
B.  The Commission shall utilize the Oklahoma Route 66 
Commission Revolving Fund as a uthorized in Section 2 of this act. 
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     Section 2, Chapter 412, O.S.L. 
2022 (69 O.S. Supp. 2023, Section 4041), is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 4041. A.  There is hereby created in the State Treasury 
a revolving fund to be designated as the "Oklahoma Route 66 
Commission Revolving Fund ", which shall consist of all monies 
appropriated, transferred, or otherwise designated to the fund by   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3232 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
law.  The revolving fun d shall be a continuing fund, not subject to 
fiscal year limitations, and shall be under the administration of 
the Oklahoma Route 66 Commission.  All monies accruing to the credit 
of said fund are hereby appropriated, and shall be budgeted and 
expended in accordance with the provisions of subsection B of this 
section for the purpose of preserving and developing Route 66 and 
commemorating the Route 66 Centennial. 
B.  No funds shall be budgeted or expended from the Oklahoma 
Route 66 Commission Revolving Fund prior to July 1, 2023, or prior 
to the approval adoption by the Legislature Commission of proposed 
promulgated permanent rules by the Commission pursuant to the 
provisions of the Administrative Procedures Act. 
C.  The Oklahoma Route 66 Commission shall pro mulgate, pursuant 
to the provisions of the Administrative Procedures Act, permanent 
rules subject to approval by the Legislature, to implement: 
1.  Application procedures for projects submitting requests for 
funds; 
2.  Processes for awarding of funding app lications; 
3.  Details of the Commission 's general duties; 
4.  Reporting requirements of the Commission to the Legislature; 
and 
5.  Any other rules necessary to carry out the purpose and 
mission of the Commission as expressed in this act.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB3232 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
D.  All unencumbered funds remaining in the Oklahoma Route 66 
Commission Revolving Fund upon the expiration of the Oklahoma Route 
66 Commission shall be transferred to the State Treasurer for 
deposit in the General Revenue Fund. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON TOURISM AND WILDLIFE 
March 25, 2024 - DO PASS AS AMENDED