House | 02/13/2024 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Remove Representative Culver as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lawson | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Remove Representative Lawson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Culver | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Lawson | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |