House
|
05/15/2024
|
Vetoed 05/15/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Baker
|
|
|