Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 24, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 2, 2024