House | 02/29/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Withdrawn from Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Baker | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |