House
|
05/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Davis
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Seifried
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, West (Tammy), Moore, Sims
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sterling, Caldwell (Chad), McBride
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Baker
|
|
|