Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024