House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Roe
|
|
|