Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Swope
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Menz
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 35
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Hefner, Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Roe
|
|
|