Senate | 03/25/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |