Senate | 04/02/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 7 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Wallace | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative McEntire |