House
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/06/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 23; Ayes: 68 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|