Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2024