Senate | 03/28/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Green | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Rogers | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Archer |