Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Maynard | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Boatman |