House
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pfeiffer
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative Archer
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Moore
|
|
|