Senate | 04/02/2024 | Emergency removed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Munson | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Deck | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Johns |