House
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Johns
|
|
|