House
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Johns
|
|
|