Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024