Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 29 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Authored by Senator Hicks (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Ranson |