Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3560 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024