House
|
05/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Manger
|
|
|