Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3567 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024