Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3571 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill February 18, 2024