House
|
05/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator Alvord (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Hill
|
|
|