Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3595 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill February 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2024