Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 23, 2024