Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 25 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 68 Nays: 9 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Pae | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 53 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Remove Representative Hill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pae | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Hill |