Senate | 04/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kerbs, Cantrell, Townley, Archer, Grego, Pae, Luttrell, Dobrinski, May | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Hill |