House | 04/23/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative McDugle |