Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3634 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024