Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 10 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Miller |