House
|
04/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Garvin
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|