Senate | 04/29/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Newhouse | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Green | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Kannady |