Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024