Senate | 03/25/2024 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Authored by Senator Alvord (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Dempsey |