Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Motion expired
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Grego
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 29; Ayes: 60 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Murdock
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Remove Senator Murdock as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Smith, Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Grego
|
|
|