Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Coauthored by Representative George | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Seifried (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Duel |