House | 04/23/2024 | SA's received | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 17 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lowe (Jason) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Duel |