Senate | 03/25/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative George |