Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Hefner |