Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber, Swope | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Young (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Hefner, McEntire, Roe |